Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Kelly, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Benin City


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1894BornBallinasloe, Ireland
29 Jun 192126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
11 Dec 193945.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}
11 Dec 193945.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thignica
2 Jun 194045.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thignica
18 Apr 195055.6AppointedBishop of Benin City, Nigeria
5 Jul 197378.8RetiredBishop of Benin City, Nigeria
18 Aug 199197.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Benin City, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Kelly:
Bishop Patrick Joseph Kelly S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Benin City

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 51.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013