Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Heerey, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Onitsha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1890BornCastlerahan, Ireland
24 Sep 192130.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
24 Jan 192736.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}
24 Jan 192736.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Balanea
29 May 192736.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balanea
21 May 193140.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}
18 Apr 195059.4AppointedArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
6 Feb 196776.2DiedArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Charles Heerey:
Archbishop Charles Heerey C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop of Onitsha

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013