Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Umberto Gianni, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Bouar, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1939 Born
21 Sep 196323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Feb 197838.4AppointedBishop of Bouar, Central African Republic
19 Nov 197839.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bouar, Central African Republic
2 Dec 201778.1RetiredBishop of Bouar, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Armando Umberto Gianni
Bishop Armando Umberto Gianni O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bouar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGragnola

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bouar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast