Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Paul Yelezuome Angkyier

Bishop of Damongo, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1961 Born
15 Aug 199230.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tamale, Ghana
3 Feb 199533.1IncardinatedPriest of Damongo, Ghana
17 Dec 201049.0AppointedBishop of Damongo, Ghana
25 Mar 201149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Damongo, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Peter Paul Yelezuome Angkyier
Bishop Peter Paul Yelezuome Angkyier (born ) Bishop of Damongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNandon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Damongo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,971

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast