Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Múgica y Urrestarazu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vitoria

Titular Bishop of Cinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1870BornIdiazabal
23 Dec 189323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vitoria, Spain
22 Feb 191847.4AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
20 May 191847.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
26 Oct 192353.0AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
10 Mar 192857.4AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
12 Oct 193767.0ResignedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
12 Oct 193767.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
27 Oct 196898.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Vitoria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Múgica y Urrestarazu:
Bishop Mateo Múgica y Urrestarazu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vitoria

  • a priest for 74.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015