Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Colom y Canals, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1879BornSóller
11 Sep 189617.4ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
17 Aug 190223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
29 Jul 192142.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
29 Jul 192142.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Andrapa
24 Aug 192142.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andrapa
14 Dec 192243.7AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
16 Dec 193354.7DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Colom y Canals:
Bishop Mateo Colom y Canals O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 64
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013