Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop León (Miguel) Angel Olano y Urteaga, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guam

Titular Bishop of Lagina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1891BornAlzo, Spain
18 Dec 191524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Jul 193442.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
9 Jul 193442.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagina
5 May 193543.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagina
20 Aug 194553.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
21 May 197078.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for León (Miguel) Angel Olano y Urteaga:
Bishop León (Miguel) Angel Olano y Urteaga O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guam

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013