Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Isidro Guerrero Macías

Bishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1951 BornIraguato
22 Apr 197321.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 199746.0AppointedBishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México
17 Sep 199746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México

MicroData Summary for José Isidro Guerrero Macías:
Bishop José Isidro Guerrero Macías (born ) Bishop of Mexicali

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mexicali.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015