Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Akichi

Deceased

Bishop of Grand-Bassam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1933BornMemni
25 Mar 196330.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 198249.4AppointedBishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire
18 Sep 198249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire
5 Apr 199360.3DiedBishop of Grand-Bassam, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Joseph Akichi:
Bishop Joseph Akichi (died ) Bishop of Grand-Bassam

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013