Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Floriberto Cornelis, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alagoinhas, Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1910BornGent, Belgium
28 Jul 193524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Nov 195848.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Katanga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Nov 195848.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunes
27 Dec 195848.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunes
10 Nov 195949.1AppointedArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Apr 196756.5ResignedArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Apr 196756.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Capra
13 Nov 197464.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Alagoinhas, Baia, Brazil
24 May 198675.6RetiredBishop of Alagoinhas, Baia, Brazil
20 Dec 200191.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Alagoinhas, Baia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Floriberto Cornelis:
Archbishop José Floriberto Cornelis O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alagoinhas

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013