Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Antonio Cardinal Ferretto

Deceased

Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto

Titular See: (Sect/Sacred College of Cardinals)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1899BornRoma
24 Feb 192323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Dec 195859.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
27 Dec 195859.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serdica
20 Jan 195959.8AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
16 Jan 196161.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
16 Jan 196161.8Elevated to Cardinal
26 Mar 196162.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
7 Apr 196768.0AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
1 Mar 197373.9ResignedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
17 Mar 197374.0DiedMajor Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Ferretto:
Giuseppe Antonio Cardinal Ferretto (born , died ) Major Penitentiary Emeritus of Apostolic Penitentiary

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014