Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lazarus Vitalis Msimbe, S.D.S.

Bishop of Morogoro, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1963 Born
8 Dec 198723.9ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Savior
8 Dec 199430.9Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Savior
21 Jun 199834.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
13 Feb 201955.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Morogoro, Tanzania
31 May 202157.4AppointedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
19 Sep 202157.7Ordained BishopBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Lazarus Vitalis Msimbe
Bishop Lazarus Vitalis Msimbe S.D.S. (born ) Bishop of Morogoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHomboza, Diocese of Morogoro
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Minor Seminary, Morogoro, Diocese of Morogoro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Morogoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2019
  • b: CB, 14 Feb 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 9 Sep 2021
  • c2+: CB, 19 Sep 2021
  • ob.loc: AM, 29 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast