Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zé-Doca

Dioecesis Zedocanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jan Kot, O.M.I., Bishop
  • Carlo Ellena, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 5 July 1991
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Maranho
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 35,110 (13,561 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste V
  • Mailing Address: Av. do Comercio 165, C.P. 05, 65365-000 Ze Doca, MA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (098)3655-3322
  • Fax: 3655-3184

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Cândido Mendes
16 October 1961ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Pinheiro Territorial Prelature of Cândido Mendes (erected)
Diocese of Cândido Mendes
13 October 1983ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Cândido Mendes Diocese of Cândido Mendes
Diocese of Zé-Doca
5 July 1991Name ChangedDiocese of Cândido Mendes Diocese of Zé-Doca

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Cândido Mendes
196345,00050,00090.0%776,42873ap1967
196863,00066,18395.2%6397,0003163ap1971
197675,00080,00093.8%6289,3752215ap1977
198065,70083,00079.2%86144,69273312ap1981
Diocese of Cândido Mendes
1990240,000282,00085.1%661220,000133613ap1991
Diocese of Zé-Doca
1999277,000318,00087.1%1241617,312112311ap2000
2000280,000322,00087.0%641028,000112411ap2001
2001260,000300,00086.7%1141517,3331121911ap2002
2002260,000300,00086.7%1552013,000131811ap2003
2003260,000284,93291.2%1021221,666111512ap2004
2004260,000284,93291.2%1121320,00081712ap2005
2010293,000319,00091.8%2022213,318191416ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014