Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félicien-Patrice Makouaka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Franceville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1922BornNgomo-Boulongo
10 Oct 195432.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 197452.7AppointedBishop of Franceville, Gabon
12 Jan 197553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Franceville, Gabon
8 Nov 199674.8RetiredBishop of Franceville, Gabon
7 Feb 200078.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Franceville, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Félicien-Patrice Makouaka
Bishop Félicien-Patrice Makouaka (born 1922, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Franceville

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Apr 2016