Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James (Jaime) Collins, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Miracema do Tocantins, Tocatins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1921BornMoyvane, Ireland
8 Sep 193918.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
3 Sep 194423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Oct 196645.6AppointedPrelate of Miracema do Norte, Goias, Brazil
15 Aug 196746.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tetci
14 Sep 196746.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tetci
26 May 197857.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Tetci
17 Sep 198160.5AppointedBishop of Miracema do Norte, Brazil
14 Feb 199674.9RetiredBishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Tocatins, Brazil
4 Oct 200281.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Miracema do Tocantins, Tocatins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for James (Jaime) Collins:
Bishop James (Jaime) Collins C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Miracema do Tocantins

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015