Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Basilio Morales Galindo, O. de M.

Bishop of Copiapó, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1972 Born
7 Mar 199926.4First VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
24 Jun 200532.7Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
3 Mar 200633.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
11 Jun 201845.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Puerto Montt, Chile
29 Feb 202047.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Puerto Montt, Chile
20 Jun 202047.7AppointedBishop of Copiapó, Chile
12 Sep 202048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Copiapó, Chile

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Basilio Morales Galindo
Bishop Ricardo Basilio Morales Galindo O. de M. (born ) Bishop of Copiapó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Fernando, Diocese of Rancagua
Ordained BishopCathedral, Copiapó, Diocese of Copiapó

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Copiapó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2018
  • b/c1: CB, 11 Jun 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2020
  • firs: CB, 20 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 21 Jul 2020
  • c2: CB, 1 Sep 2020
  • c34: CB, 2 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 12 Sep 2020

Quantcast