Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celmo Lazzari, C.S.I.

Vicar Apostolic of San Miguel de Sucumbķos

Titular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1956 BornGaribaldi, Brazil
18 Dec 198226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Joseph
11 Jun 201054.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
11 Jun 201054.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari
9 Oct 201054.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari
21 Nov 201357.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Miguel de Sucumbķos, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Celmo Lazzari:
Bishop Celmo Lazzari C.S.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of San Miguel de Sucumbķos

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of San Miguel de Sucumbķos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,852
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014