Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Paul D’Souza

Bishop Emeritus of Mangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1941 Born
3 Dec 196625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mangalore, India
11 Jan 199654.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mangalore, India
11 Jan 199654.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
15 May 199654.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dura
8 Nov 199655.3AppointedBishop of Mangalore, India
3 Jul 201877.0RetiredBishop of Mangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Paul D’Souza
Bishop Aloysius Paul D’Souza (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgrar
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Rosary, Cathedral, Mangalore, Diocese of Mangalore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mangalore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,721
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 15 Sep 2018

Quantcast