Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Cadi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1861Born
21 Nov 188423.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 188927.6AppointedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
10 Feb 1889³27.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
16 Nov 193978.3ResignedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
16 Nov 193978.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
22 Sep 194180.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Cadi
Archbishop Nicolas Cadi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bosra e Haūrān

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)
Ordained BishopDamas, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 52.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017