Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Chami, S.M.S.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1890Born
29 Jun 192231.5Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
13 Nov 194352.9AppointedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Oct 194453.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
19 Aug 196776.6DiedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Pierre Chami
Archbishop Pierre Chami S.M.S.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bosra e Haūrān

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoun, Lebanon

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast