Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Malouf, S.M.S.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1893Born
20 Jul 192531.6Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
5 Oct 193743.8SelectedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
26 Oct 193743.8ConfirmedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
26 Oct 193743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
18 Nov 196470.9AppointedArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
5 Mar 196874.2DiedArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Malouf
Archbishop Joseph Malouf S.M.S.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Baalbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZabbougha
Ordained BishopCathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 69
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,792

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast