Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agapitos Malouf, B.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1847Born
29 Mar 189648.9AppointedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
29 Mar 189648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
12 Feb 192274.7DiedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Agapitos Malouf
Bishop Agapitos Malouf B.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Baalbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWadi-el-Karm
Ordained BishopBeirut, Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek)

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017