Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eftimios Youakim, B.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Titular Archbishop of Scythopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1886Born
12 Mar 191225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
30 Oct 192640.3SelectedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
9 Dec 192640.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
20 Jun 192741.0ConfirmedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
18 Nov 196478.4AppointedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
21 Aug 197185.1RetiredArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
21 Aug 197185.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
19 May 197285.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Eftimios Youakim
Archbishop Eftimios Youakim B.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQaytuleh

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast