Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leontios Kilzi, B.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1877Born
23 Aug 190528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
10 Jul 194467.1AppointedBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
22 Oct 194467.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
11 Aug 195174.2ResignedBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
11 Aug 195174.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
4 Jul 196386.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Leontios Kilzi
Bishop Leontios Kilzi B.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bāniyās

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast