Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Homsi

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

Titular Bishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1852Born
14 Sep 187421.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 189946.4AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
12 May 189946.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti
8 Sep 189946.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti
1908¹55.1ResignedPatriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Feb 192673.2DiedPatriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Homsi
Bishop Ignazio Homsi (born , died ) Patriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamasco, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)
Ordained BishopZahleh, Diocese of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017