Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim José de Miranda Coutinho

Deceased

Bishop of Castelo Branco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1756¹BornCoimbra
21 Feb 182064.1AppointedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
7 May 182064.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal
6 Apr 183175.3DiedBishop of Castelo Branco, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquim José de Miranda Coutinho:
Bishop Joaquim José de Miranda Coutinho (died ) Bishop of Castelo Branco

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 140
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,720

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013