Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim de Sant’Ana Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1755BornSetúbal
30 Aug 177822.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 181963.7SelectedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
17 Dec 181964.2ConfirmedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
16 Apr 182064.5Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
23 Nov 182368.2ResignedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
2 Jan 183377.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim de Sant’Ana Carvalho:
Bishop Joaquim de Sant’Ana Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faro {Algarve}

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013