Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Barwa

Bishop of Simdega, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1953 Born
2 May 198430.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 199844.6AppointedBishop of Purnea, India
8 Nov 199845.0Ordained BishopBishop of Purnea, India
29 Sep 200450.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ranchi, India
29 Sep 200450.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acufida
11 Feb 200854.3AppointedBishop of Simdega, India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Barwa
Bishop Vincent Barwa (born ) Bishop of Simdega

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRengarih

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Simdega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,446

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast