Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Kozhimala

Deceased

Bishop of Bhagalpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1939Born
17 Oct 197030.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 199656.5AppointedBishop of Bhagalpur, India
7 Oct 199656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bhagalpur, India
1 Jun 200565.4DiedBishop of Bhagalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kozhimala
Bishop Thomas Kozhimala (born , died ) Bishop of Bhagalpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKanjirapally

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,855
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast