Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop René-Pierre Mignen

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1875Born
18 Dec 189722.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 192247.5AppointedBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
21 Nov 192247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
30 Nov 192247.8InstalledBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
21 Jul 193156.5AppointedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
14 Oct 193156.7InstalledArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
1 Nov 193964.7DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for René-Pierre Mignen
Archbishop René-Pierre Mignen (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Chapelle-Palluau

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast