Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Chudzio

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Titular Bishop of Marazanae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1963 Born
14 Jun 198824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
3 Apr 202056.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
3 Apr 202056.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
2 May 202056.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Chudzio
Bishop Krzysztof Chudzio (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrzemyśl, Archdiocese of Przemyśl
Ordained BishopAssumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary and St. John the Baptist, Cathedral Basilica, Przemyśl, Archdiocese of Przemyśl

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Przemyśl.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2020
  • c1: CB, 3 Apr 2020
  • ob: CB, 27 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 May 2020

Quantcast