Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Porto Novo

Dioecesis Portus Novi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cotonou
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Benin
  • Square Kilometers: 4,545 (1,755 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 01 B.P. 380, Porto-Novo, Benin
  • Telephone: 20.21.32.01
  • Fax: 20.21.49.83

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Porto Novo
5 April 1954ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Ouidah Vicariate Apostolic of Porto Novo (erected)
Diocese of Porto Novo
14 September 1955ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Porto Novo Diocese of Porto Novo (erected)
5 April 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Cotonou
Diocese of Porto Novo
Diocese of Abomey (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Porto Novo
1970109,640535,50320.5%1315283,915155215ap1971
1980144,000697,00020.7%147216,85773319ap1981
1990242,634855,00028.4%236298,36676022ap1991
1998326,6231,080,00030.2%473506,53247526ap2001
2001345,3251,150,53830.0%424467,50758026ap2002
2002348,0671,153,43330.2%504546,44558526ap2003
2003361,7401,168,10331.0%574615,93058629ap2004
2004370,0101,178,18531.4%553586,37947133ap2005
2010702,0001,260,00055.7%10661126,267129953ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Mar 2013