Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Yaw Afoakwa

Bishop of Obuasi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1955 BornAkrokerry
11 Jul 199237.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kumasi, Ghana
3 Mar 199540.1IncardinatedPriest of Obuasi, Ghana
22 Nov 201459.8AppointedBishop of Obuasi, Ghana
10 Jan 201559.9Ordained BishopBishop of Obuasi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for John Yaw Afoakwa:
Bishop John Yaw Afoakwa (born ) Bishop of Obuasi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Obuasi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 12 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015