Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Reginaldo Lira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1915Born
21 Sep 193823.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 195842.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina
16 Jul 195842.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tenedus
7 Sep 195843.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tenedus
12 Jun 196145.7AppointedBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
27 Oct 196146.1InstalledBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
22 Jun 196549.7ResignedBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
22 Jun 196549.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Mauretania
196751.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina
15 May 197862.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Mauretania
15 May 197862.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina
11 Dec 201297.2DiedBishop Emeritus of San Francisco, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro Reginaldo Lira
Bishop Pedro Reginaldo Lira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalta

  • a priest for 74.2 years
  • a bishop for 54.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast