Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Malakal

Dioecesis Malakalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 12 December 1974
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Juba
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Sudan
  • Square Kilometers: 238,000 (91,927 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Church, P.O. Box 27, Malakal, U.N.S., Sud Sudan
  • Telephone: (909)286.497

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kodok
10 January 1933ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Khartoum Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kodok (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Kodok
4 August 1938ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Kodok Prefecture Apostolic of Kodok
Prefecture Apostolic of Malakal
14 July 1949Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Kodok Prefecture Apostolic of Malakal
Diocese of Malakal
12 December 1974ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Malakal Diocese of Malakal

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Malakal
19502,388712,000.3%2121113174ap1951
196913,8261,252,6001.1%662,3042ap1971
Diocese of Malakal
198031,3902,153,0001.5%37103,139849ap1981
199031,0002,000,0001.6%4483,875482ap1991
199953,0002,765,0001.9%6286,625479ap2000
200060,0002,770,0002.2%92115,454489ap2001
200165,0002,775,0002.3%91106,500289ap2002
200268,0002,780,0002.4%93125,666489ap2003
200373,0003,520,0002.1%113145,214489ap2004
200477,8243,932,0002.0%16164,864189ap2005
2010876,0004,450,00019.7%12102239,818151216ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013