Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bougainville

Dioecesis Buganvillensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bernard Unabali, Bishop
  • Henk Kronenberg, S.M., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 November 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Rabaul
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Papua New Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 10,660 (4,117 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 85, Buka, North Solomons Province, Papua New Guinea
  • Telephone: 973.90.44
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of German Solomon Islands
23 May 1898ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Prefecture Apostolic of German Solomon Islands (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands
21 January 1904Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of German Solomon Islands Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands
31 May 1930ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands
11 June 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Solomon Islands (erected)
Diocese of Bougainville
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Solomon Islands Diocese of Bougainville

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bougainville
197060,58578,80076.9%531361,68269951ap1971
198084,000102,85081.7%526312,7091629027ap1981
1990124,000131,80094.1%825333,7576062ap1991*
1999135,100175,00077.2%1010206,755253732ap2000
2000160,000190,00084.2%1014246,666193631ap2001
2001165,069196,00084.2%1013237,176333931ap2002
2002145,380175,60082.8%1411255,815404531ap2003
2003146,475177,20082.7%149236,368364432ap2004
2004147,350180,00081.9%158236,406224632ap2005
2006149,200183,50081.3%1014246,216304831ap2007
2012143,583219,29465.5%1713304,786345431ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013