Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Orowae

Bishop of Wabag


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1955 BornAiopa
14 Dec 198328.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
14 Dec 199944.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
14 Dec 199944.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
4 Mar 200044.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
19 Oct 200449.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
30 Jun 200853.0SucceededBishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Arnold Orowae:
Bishop Arnold Orowae (born ) Bishop of Wabag

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wabag.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013