Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cherubim Dambui

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Subbar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1948Born
5 Dec 197426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
30 Oct 200052.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
30 Oct 200052.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Subbar
10 Feb 200152.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Subbar
24 Jun 201062.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Cherubim Dambui
Bishop Cherubim Dambui (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Port Moresby

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTimbunke

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,901
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast