Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Baldo Riva, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Prelate of Chuquibamba, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1922Born
29 Sep 194018.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Mar 194724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Mar 196946.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
13 Mar 196946.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarda
20 Apr 196946.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarda
27 Jun 197755.0AppointedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru
15 Jan 197855.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Sarda
27 Jun 198361.0DiedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis Baldo Riva
Bishop Luis Baldo Riva C.SS.R. (born , died ) Prelate of Chuquibamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast