Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Matthew Darius, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Grenada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1955BornCrochi
28 Jun 198731.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Jul 200246.8AppointedBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Grenada, Antilles
2 Oct 200247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Grenada, Antilles
26 Apr 201660.6DiedBishop of Saint George’s in Grenada, Grenada, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Vincent Matthew Darius
Bishop Vincent Matthew Darius O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint George’s in Grenada

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016