Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Thomas McGee

Bishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1965 Born
29 Jun 198923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Dec 201550.2AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
18 Feb 201650.3Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Brian Thomas McGee
Bishop Brian Thomas McGee (born ) Bishop of Argyll and The Isles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreenock, Renfrewshire, Diocese of Paisley, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Church, Greenock, Renfrewshire, Diocese of Paisley, Scotland
Ordained BishopSaint Columba, Cathedral, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Argyll and The Isles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2016
  • mn: CL, 25 Jan 2016
  • c2: CB, 17 Feb 2016
  • c1: CL, 17 Feb 2016
  • c34: CL, 18 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,844
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 6 Feb 2018