Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Aloysius Mone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1929Born
12 Jun 195222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Apr 198454.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Apr 198454.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abercornia
14 May 198454.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abercornia
8 Mar 198858.7AppointedBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Oct 200475.2RetiredBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Oct 201687.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Aloysius Mone (VIAF: 315693253)
Bishop John Aloysius Mone (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paisley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlasgow

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 14 Oct 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018