Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo William Cushley

Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1961 Born
7 Jul 198524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Jul 201352.0AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Sep 201352.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Leo William Cushley
Archbishop Leo William Cushley (born ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAirdrie, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. John the Baptist, Church, Uddingston, Glasgow, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 24 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 20 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,879
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 7 Apr 2018