Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Keenan

Bishop of Paisley, Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1964 BornGlasgow
9 Jul 199530.6Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Feb 201449.1AppointedBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Mar 201449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Keenan:
Bishop John Keenan (born ) Bishop of Paisley

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paisley.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 8 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 18 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014