Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Corboy, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monze, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1916Born
28 Jul 194831.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Mar 196245.3AppointedBishop of Monze, Zambia
24 Jun 196245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Monze, Zambia
26 Nov 199175.0RetiredBishop of Monze, Zambia
24 Nov 200488.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Monze, Zambia

MicroData Summary for James Corboy
Bishop James Corboy S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCahirconlish, Ireland

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 85
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast