Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mukwaya

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1930Born
18 Dec 196030.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kampala, Uganda
10 Sep 198251.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kampala, Uganda
10 Sep 198251.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaba
31 Oct 198252.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ubaba
21 Jun 198857.7AppointedBishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda
23 Oct 200474.0ResignedBishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda
5 Sep 200877.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mukwaya
Bishop Joseph Mukwaya (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kiyinda-Mityana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKiwangula

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast