Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Harold De Jong

Deceased

Bishop of Ndola, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1931Born
20 Dec 195827.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 197544.1AppointedBishop of Ndola, Zambia
28 Sep 197544.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ndola, Zambia
17 Sep 200372.3DiedBishop of Ndola, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Dennis Harold De Jong
Bishop Dennis Harold De Jong (born , died ) Bishop of Ndola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChipata
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ndola, Diocese of Ndola

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2004, Page 1,067
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,990

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast