Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alphonsus Mathias

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1928 BornPangala
24 Aug 195426.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 196335.4AppointedBishop of Chikmagalur, India
5 Feb 196435.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chikmagalur, India
12 Sep 198658.2AppointedArchbishop of Bangalore, India
24 Mar 199869.8ResignedArchbishop of Bangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus Mathias:
Archbishop Alphonsus Mathias (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bangalore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013