Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil Salvadore D’Souza

Deceased

Bishop of Mangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1926Born
25 Mar 195225.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 196538.8AppointedBishop of Mangalore, India
11 May 196538.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mangalore, India
5 Sep 199670.2DiedBishop of Mangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Basil Salvadore D’Souza
Bishop Basil Salvadore D’Souza (born , died ) Bishop of Mangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBondel

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast