Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignatius Paul Pinto

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1925 Born
24 Aug 195227.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 198863.4AppointedBishop of Shimoga, India
31 Jan 198963.7Ordained BishopBishop of Shimoga, India
10 Sep 199873.3AppointedArchbishop of Bangalore, India
22 Jul 200479.1RetiredArchbishop of Bangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Paul Pinto
Archbishop Ignatius Paul Pinto (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBantval

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bangalore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017